SAINSBURY CENTRE ENDOWMENT FUND

Charity number: 287378
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

During the year ended 31 July 2018 there were no changes in the general policies of the Trustees. The Trust remains a grant making trust making grants in accordance with the objects. The Trustees do not make grants in response to unsolicited applications nor to individuals.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024

Total income: £428,163
Total expenditure: £464,200

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Norfolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 February 1987: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Professor David John Maguire Trustee 23 May 2023
SAINSBURY RESEARCH UNIT FOR THE ARTS OF AFRICA, OCEANIA AND THE AMERICAS
Received: On time
THE SAINSBURY INSTITUTE FOR THE STUDY OF JAPANESE ARTS AND CULTURE
Received: On time
Joseph Christopher Burns Trustee 19 November 2019
THE SAINSBURY INSTITUTE FOR THE STUDY OF JAPANESE ARTS AND CULTURE
Received: On time
SAINSBURY RESEARCH UNIT FOR THE ARTS OF AFRICA, OCEANIA AND THE AMERICAS
Received: On time
GATSBY TECHNICAL EDUCATION PROJECTS
Received: On time
THE GATSBY CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
GATSBY AFRICA
Received: On time
CENTRE FOR CITIES
Received: On time
PROFESSOR IAN PAUL DEWING Trustee 12 February 2019
SAINSBURY RESEARCH UNIT FOR THE ARTS OF AFRICA, OCEANIA AND THE AMERICAS
Received: On time
THE SAINSBURY INSTITUTE FOR THE STUDY OF JAPANESE ARTS AND CULTURE
Received: On time
DUNCAN IAN CALLAGHAN Trustee 26 June 2018
THE SAINSBURY INSTITUTE FOR THE STUDY OF JAPANESE ARTS AND CULTURE
Received: On time
SAINSBURY RESEARCH UNIT FOR THE ARTS OF AFRICA, OCEANIA AND THE AMERICAS
Received: On time
PETER HESKETH Trustee 26 June 2018
THE SAINSBURY INSTITUTE FOR THE STUDY OF JAPANESE ARTS AND CULTURE
Received: On time
SAINSBURY RESEARCH UNIT FOR THE ARTS OF AFRICA, OCEANIA AND THE AMERICAS
Received: On time
HON AND V TRUSTEE LTD Trustee 07 December 1992
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £367.33k £335.02k £394.19k £401.73k £428.16k
Total expenditure £441.65k £357.04k £418.88k £455.86k £464.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 23 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 23 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2023 27 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 27 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 20 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 20 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 09 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 09 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 27 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 27 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
DEED DATED 23 DECEMBER 1986
Charitable objects
FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH THE PROMOTION OF KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE VISUAL ARTS BY ALL MEANS AVAILABLE AT OR ASSOCIATED WITH THE CENTRE BUT PRIMARILY FOR CONTRIBUTING TOWARDS THE COST OF THE INSURANCE OF THE ROBERT AND LISA SAINSBURY COLLECTION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 16 February 1987 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
5 Wilton Road
LONDON
SW1V 1AP
Phone:
02074100330
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available