CAMBRIDGESHIRE HISTORIC CHURCHES TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The preservation repair maintenance improvement upkeep and reconstruction of Churches in the County of Cambridge and or monuments fittings fixtures stained glass furniture ornamments and chattels in such Churches. The Trust's predominant activity is the award of loans and grants to churches to assist with the cost of works falling within the foregoing description.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 27 July 1983: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neil Alastair McKittrick | Chair | 25 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Michael Farmer | Trustee | 06 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Paul Arthur Rees Skipper | Trustee | 06 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
ALFRED NICHOLAS HARDSTAFF LEIGH-SMITH | Trustee | 25 July 2024 |
|
|||||
GEOFFREY HUNTER | Trustee | 25 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
The Revd Canon Dr Nicholas John Thistlethwaite | Trustee | 25 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
DAVID CAMPBELL STAZICKER LLB FRSA | Trustee | 19 July 2016 |
|
|||||
CANON DAVID PRITCHARD | Trustee | 19 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
CANON SIMON JOHN TALBOTT | Trustee | 31 July 2013 |
|
|||||
ALISON FAY TAYLOR | Trustee | 12 March 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £35.86k | £43.80k | £48.59k | £204.03k | £68.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.70k | £36.54k | £40.42k | £44.55k | £72.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 08 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 08 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 18 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 June 2023
(These accounts |
18 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 18 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 18 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 17 December 2022 | 231 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 17 December 2022 | 231 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 02 September 2021 | 125 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 24 January 2022 | 269 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10TH JUNE 1983
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION, REPAIR, MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT, UPKEEP AND RECONSTRUCTION OF CHURCHES IN THE COUNTY OF CAMBRIDGE AND OR MONUMENTS, FITTINGS, FIXTURES, STAINED GLASS, FURNITURE, ORNAMENTS AND CHATTELS IN SUCH CHRUCHES AND OF THE CHURCHYARD BELONGING TO ANY SUCH CHURCHES.
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF CAMBRIDGESHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
9 The Chase
ELY
Cambridgeshire
CB6 3DR
- Phone:
- 01353668438
- Email:
- admin@camhct.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window