BENSTED'S CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
GRANTS MADE TO QUALIFIED APPLICANTS FOR THE RELIEF OF OLD, SICK AND INFIRM PERSONS, AND FOR THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES. APPLICANTS MUST LIVE WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHICH IS APPROXIMATELY THE TWENTY-FOUR PARISHES EAST OF TEYNHAM WITHIN THE BOUNDARY OF THE BOROUGH OF SWALE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kent
Governance
- 28 September 1983: Standard registration
- BENSTEAD'S CHARITY (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cllr Claire Martin | Chair | 22 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Cllr Kieran Joseph Michael Golding | Trustee | 25 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cllr Hannah Amanda Perkin | Trustee | 02 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Cllr Richard James Lehmann | Trustee | 02 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Cllr Antony James Hook | Trustee | 02 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Randell Valentine | Trustee | 02 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Cllr Ben Jonathan Martin | Trustee | 10 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW BOWLES | Trustee | 25 July 2005 |
|
|
||||
MR MICHAEL COSGROVE | Trustee | 27 June 2005 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW HAROLD OSBORNE | Trustee | 23 August 1989 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.83k | £23.38k | £28.63k | £38.42k | £42.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.85k | £24.40k | £74.74k | £27.81k | £48.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 16 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 16 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 23 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 23 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 24 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 24 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 13 July 2021 | 74 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 13 July 2021 | 74 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 12 MAY 1989 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 19 JUL 2010 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 09 SEP 2016 as amended on 03 Feb 2020 as amended on 23 Feb 2023
Charitable objects
(1) THE RELIEF OF NEED OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT (THE INHABITANTS OF THE SAID AREA BEING HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS "THE SAID INHABITANTS"); (2) THE RELIEF OF DISTRESS AMONG THE SAID INHABITANTS; (3) THE PROVISION AND SUPPORT (WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE) OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION; (4) THE PROVISION AND SUPPORT OF EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS; (5) ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE (WHETHER OR NOT OF A NATURE SIMILAR TO ANY OF THOSE HEREINBEFORE SPECIFIED) FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SAID INHABITANTS; PROVIDED ALWAYS THAT SUCH PURPOSES SHALL EXTEND TO THOSE PURPOSES FOR WHICH PROVISION IS MADE OUT OF RATES, TAXES OR OTHER PUBLIC FUNDS, ONLY IF AND TO THE EXTENT TO WHICH IN THE OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES FURTHER PROVISION (IN ADDITION TO THOSE MADE OUT OF RATES, TAXES OR OTHER PUBLIC FUNDS) CAN PROPERLY BE MADE FOR SUCH PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
AREA OF THE FORMER FAVERSHAM UNION
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE ALEXANDER CENTRE
15-17 PRESTON STREET
FAVERSHAM
KENT
ME13 8NZ
- Phone:
- 01795859704
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window