THE NORTHERN CERAMIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Society holds regular lecture meetings, residential seminars, and organises a summer visit to reserve &/or private collections not normally open to the public. It also publishes Newsletters, a Journal (usually annually), and other additional occasional publications when appropriate material becomes available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 13 September 1983: Standard registration
- NCS (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr RACHEL CONROY | Chair | 28 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Miller | Trustee | 13 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Claire Louise Blakey | Trustee | 27 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kate Turner | Trustee | 27 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Barker | Trustee | 21 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Wallis | Trustee | 21 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gaye Blake-Roberts | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Scott | Trustee | 19 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
MIRANDA FRANCES GOODBY | Trustee | 20 May 2017 |
|
|||||
Brian Allaker | Trustee | 06 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Mrs Pat Halfpenny | Trustee | 21 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
JESSICA DAVIES | Trustee | 15 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH SHEILA SKINNER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £57.72k | £34.67k | £19.74k | £38.50k | £35.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £59.53k | £36.15k | £21.05k | £32.98k | £35.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 18 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 17 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 17 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 11 MARCH 1972, AMENDED ON 21 MAY 1983 AND 18 MAY 2002
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE STUDY OF THE HISTORY AND MANUFACTURE OF POTTERY AND PORCELAIN.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Petton Hall
Petton
Burlton
SHREWSBURY
SY4 5TH
- Phone:
- 01939270752
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window