Trustees THE BRITISH AND IRISH HYPERTENSION SOCIETY

Charity number: 287635

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Manish Saxena Trustee 10 September 2024
None on record
Dr Helen Warren Trustee 10 September 2024
None on record
Dr Ryan McNally Trustee 10 September 2024
None on record
Professor Phil Chowienczyk Trustee 19 September 2023
None on record
Dr Pankaj Gupta Trustee 13 September 2022
None on record
Sam Olden Trustee 13 September 2022
None on record
Dr James Peter Sheppard Trustee 14 September 2021
None on record
Professor Ian Wilkinson Trustee 14 September 2021
None on record
Dr Luca Faconti Trustee 17 September 2019
None on record