KETTERING AND DISTRICT EISTEDDFOD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Eisteddfod, which takes place annually in March, is open to anyone from the ages of 5 to 105!! We are very well established in the town. We provide a valuable service to the local community giving a wide range of opportunities for people in the area to share their talents. There are three main sections: Speech and Drama, Instrumental and Vocal offering a variety of classes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 14 November 1983: Standard registration
- 15 May 2015: Funds received from 306048 THE LAWN YOUTH CENTRE TRUST
- 14 January 2021: Funds transferred to 292172 NORTHAMPTON FESTIVAL OF THE PERFORMING ARTS
- 14 January 2021: Funds transferred to 1013625 OUNDLE FESTIVAL OF MUSIC AND DRAMA
- 14 January 2021: Funds transferred to 1145643 NORTHAMPTONSHIRE MUSIC AND PERFORMING ARTS TRUST
- 14 January 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2015 | 30/04/2016 | 30/04/2017 | 30/04/2018 | 30/04/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.02k | £7.65k | £7.39k | £7.40k | £174 | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.78k | £7.18k | £6.80k | £6.04k | £50 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2019 | 24 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2018 | 24 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2017 | 28 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19TH SEPTEMBER 1983 AS AMENDED 13TH JUNE 1996 AND 7TH JUNE 2000
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS, AND IN PARTICULAR THE ARTS OF MUSIC, SPEECH AND DRAMA, AND DANCE IN ALL THEIR BRANCHES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window