Financial history G M C TRUST

Charity number: 288418
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £133.95k £57.17k £133.56k £133.82k £128.84k
Total expenditure £121.35k £114.46k £193.92k £140.23k £124.26k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A