Accounts and annual returns HIGHGATE PRIMARY AND BLANCHE NEVILE PRIMARY SCHOOL ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 288558

Charity reporting is up to date (52 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 22 October 2024 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 22 October 2024 | 52 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 27 October 2023 | 57 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 27 October 2023 | 57 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 13 December 2022 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 13 December 2022 | 104 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 06 March 2022 | 187 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 06 March 2022 | 187 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 14 August 2019 | 17 June 2021 | 368 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 August 2019 | 17 June 2021 | 368 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window