THE SOCIETY FOR THE STUDY OF LABOUR HISTORY

Charity number: 288599
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Society promotes the study of labour history by: production of a journal, Labour History Review; holding and sponsoring conferences; bursaries for postgraduate speakers at such conferences; bursaries for (doctoral-level) research and BA/MA dissertations in labour history; grants for conferences and public events in labour history, especially if targeted at a wider audience.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £13,603
Total expenditure: £19,806

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 07 February 1984: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • Labour History Society (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr JOAN ALLEN Chair
None on record
Dr Janette Lisa Martin Trustee 29 October 2022
FRIENDS OF MARSDEN LIBRARY
Received: On time
Dr Quentin Outram Trustee 14 September 2019
None on record
PROFESSOR KEITH LAYBOURN Trustee 14 October 2012
None on record
PROFESSOR JOHN CHARLES BELCHEM Trustee 14 October 2012
HISTORIC SOCIETY OF LANCASHIRE AND CHESHIRE
Received: On time
MERSEYSIDE BUILDINGS PRESERVATION TRUST
Received: On time
Dr DAVID LYDDON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £11.64k £12.37k £12.19k £13.19k £13.60k
Total expenditure £11.65k £9.38k £8.45k £12.25k £19.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 13 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 11 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 04 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 27 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
16 Church Plantation
Keele
Newcastle
ST5 5AY
Phone:
01782712317