THE ARTS SOCIETY NORTH DEVON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Society has as its objects the promotion and advancement of aesthetic education and the cultivation and study of the decorative and fine arts, and the giving of aid to the conservation of our national artistic heritage for the benefit of the public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Devon
Governance
- 13 February 1984: Standard registration
- NDDFAS (Working name)
- NORTH DEVON DECORATIVE AND FINE ARTS SOCIETY (Working name)
- THE NORTH DEVON DECORATIVE AND FINE ARTS SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Irene Herman | Trustee | 11 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gwen Pearson | Trustee | 11 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
HELEN TURNER | Trustee | 11 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
joan samuels | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
tricia palk | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
barbara Vercoe | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.05k | £4.19k | £4.21k | £10.00k | £11.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.76k | £5.40k | £10.24k | £12.36k | £11.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 21 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 23 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 6TH DECEMBER 1983 AND AMENDED 11TH DECEMBER 1989 as amended on 07 Apr 2018
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION AND ADVANCEMENT OF AESTHETIC EDUCATION AND THE CULTIVATION AND STUDY OF THE DECORATIVE AND FINE ARTS; AND THE GIVING OF AID TO THE CONSERVATION OF OUR NATIONAL ARTISTIC HERITAGE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Clapper Cottage
Bondleigh
NORTH TAWTON
Devon
EX20 2AU
- Phone:
- 0183782980
- Email:
- irene.herman@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window