ST AGNES DISCRETIONARY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
support and further the Catholic tradition within the Church of England generally where such tradition is maintained; special reference to St Agnes Kennington Park though trustees have discretion to make grants to other churches or activities based at churches where such a tradition remains.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England
Governance
- 29 February 1984: Standard registration
- 23 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 28 February 2013: Re-registered
- FATHER JOHN WHITELAM'S CHARITY FUND (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Thomas Brian Hatton | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|||||||
Deborah Elizabeth Hall | Trustee | 21 March 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Rev CLIVE WESLEY JONES | Trustee | 31 July 2019 |
|
|||||||
Jennifer Salau | Trustee | 21 January 2014 |
|
|
||||||
MALCOLM TAYLOR | Trustee | 04 March 2013 |
|
|
||||||
JONATHAN MARTIN ROBIN PRICHARD | Trustee | 28 February 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.52k | £2.76k | £2.80k | £2.91k | £2.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.50k | £2.50k | £2.80k | £29 | £5.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 07 FEBRUARY 1984
Charitable objects
(A) THE MAINTENANCE AND FURTHERANCE OF THE CATHOLIC TRADITION OF HT CHURCH OF ENGLAND TO THE BENEFIT OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND GENERALLY WHERE SUCH TRADITION IS MAINTAINED BUT WITHOUT LIMITING THE DISCRETION OF THE TRUSTEES WITH SPECIAL REFERENCE TO SAINT AGNES KENNINGTON PARK WHILE SUCH CHURCH MAINTAINS SUCH CATHOLIC TRADITION AS TO BE BY GOD'S HELP A LASTING WITNESS FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF HIS GLORY AND THE GOOD OF HIS CHURCH AND (B) FOR THE AVOIDANCE OF DOUBT THE TRADITION THAT IS HERE REFERRED TO IS THAT OF FAITH AND ORDER IN THE UNDIVIDED CHURCH SUCH AS DENIES THE POSSIBILITY OF FEMALE ORDINATION AND CONSECRATION. (SEE TRUST DEED FOR FULL DETAILS).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 NEW DORSET STREET
BRIGHTON
BN1 3LL
- Phone:
- 01273202497
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window