THE CAMBRIDGE NAZARETH TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trust provides funds for educational resources for young people in the Christian schools in the Holy Land, primarily in Palestine and Jordan. Money is raised by individuals and organisations making regular subscriptions and one-off donations to the trust.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Israel
- Jordan
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
Governance
- 15 May 1984: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARGARET MARY WADDINGHAM | Chair | 20 October 2016 |
|
|||||
Donald James McEwen | Trustee | 18 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP PARKER | Trustee | 18 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mgr Eugene Laird Harkness | Trustee | 28 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
MR BENEDICT MCHUGO | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.36k | £16.31k | £14.26k | £17.18k | £16.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.33k | £28.06k | £12.60k | £14.43k | £25.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 21 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 10 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 24 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 11 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 11TH MARCH 1984
Charitable objects
FOR THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATION IN ISRAEL JORDAN AND LEBANON (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 11TH MARCH 1984).
Area of benefit
ISRAEL, JORDAN AND LEBANON
Contact information
- Address:
-
31 FAIRDENE ROAD
COULSDON
CR5 1RD
- Phone:
- 07484124055
- Website:
-
cambridgenazarethtrust.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window