THE FRIENDS OF ST MATTHEW'S CHURCH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Friends of St Matthew's Church are to advance the Christian religion in the parish of St Matthew's, St Leonards-on-sea by the maintenance and improvement of the fabric, fixtures and fittings of the Church and Church Hall.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- East Sussex
Governance
- 24 April 1984: Standard registration
- 21 March 2025: Removed (Funds spent (by trustees))
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £113 | £65 | £8 | £200 | £495 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28/03/1984
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN THE PARISH OF ST. MATTHEW'S, ST. LEONARD-ON-SEA BY THE MAINTENANCE AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE FABRIC FIXTURES AND FITTINGS OF THE CHURCH AND CHURCH HALL.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF ST. MATTHEW'S, ST LEONARDS-ON-SEA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window