THE MILITARY HISTORICAL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promotes the study of the history of the uniformed forces of the crown by talk, discussions, visits to museums, an annual exhibition and the publication of a quarterly magazine & booklets on particular aspects of military history. Promotes the collection of objects of military interest.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
Governance
- 21 May 1984: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BRIGADIER CLIVE RICHARD ELDERTON CBE | Chair | 02 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
BRIGADIER JAMES KENNETH TANNER OBE | Trustee | 09 September 2023 |
|
|||||
ANTHONY McCLENAGHAN | Trustee | 12 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
LIEUTENANT COLONEL CHRISTOPHER ANDREW MILLWATER | Trustee | 12 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Timothy David Withey | Trustee | 21 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Patrick Crowley | Trustee | 10 September 2016 |
|
|||||
Dr JOHN ALAN MURDOCH | Trustee | 12 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
GARY GIBBS | Trustee | 02 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
MR BILL HERBERT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £77.14k | £16.47k | £23.73k | £19.51k | £19.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.45k | £13.14k | £16.80k | £19.05k | £18.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 08 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 12TH MARCH 1977 AS AMENDED 17TH MARCH 1984 as amended on 12 Sep 2020
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PROMOTION OF THE STUDY OF THE HISTORY OF THE UNIFORMED FORCES OF THE CROWN, OF UNIFROMS AND WEAPONS AND ALL ASPECTS OF MILITARY HISTORY, AND THE DISSEMINATION OF KNOWLEDGE RELATING TO SUCH MATTERS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wellington View
Bollington Road
Bollington
MACCLESFIELD
Cheshire
SK10 5EL
- Phone:
- 01625 574908
- Email:
- mhs@jamurdoch.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window