Financial history ST LUKE'S HOSPICE (BASILDON AND DISTRICT) LIMITED

Charity number: 289466
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £8.95m £13.30m £9.89m £8.96m £11.81m
Total expenditure £9.09m £8.24m £7.92m £8.56m £11.82m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £6.46m N/A
Income from government grants N/A £2.50m £1.84m N/A £9.44m
Income - Donations and legacies £2.67m £5.07m £1.72m £1.50m £1.23m
Income - Other trading activities £945.52k £491.34k £671.00k £936.97k £946.75k
Income - Charitable activities £5.33m £7.73m £7.48m £6.48m £9.45m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £9.05k £7.76k £9.66k £31.88k £133.67k
Income - Other £0 £0 £325 £12.72k £43.60k
Income - Legacies £427.50k £283.30k £282.61k £680.17k £149.10k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £8.51m £7.86m £7.46m £8.00m £11.18m
Expenditure - Raising funds £582.34k £371.66k £456.09k £562.27k £635.74k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £6.50k £6.50k £0 £6.50k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0