THE FARMLAND MUSEUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of the education of the public in the social and natural history, geology and archaeology of England with particular reference to agriculture and agricultural history in Cambridgeshire and the Fens.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £2,400 from 2 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 12 June 1984: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen George Archer | Chair | 23 May 2018 |
|
|
||||||||
Samuel Oliver Venn | Trustee | 10 December 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr Helen Phillips | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr ROBERT MICHAEL WILLIAMSON | Trustee | 11 September 2019 |
|
|||||||||
Dr Fiona Moraig McMillan | Trustee | 20 March 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Vivienne Atkinson | Trustee | 20 March 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Caroline Anne Hunt | Trustee | 29 July 2015 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr JANE RATA WILLIAMSON MBE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £73.42k | £88.79k | £100.57k | £178.13k | £171.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £77.65k | £57.13k | £97.42k | £129.85k | £148.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £8.50k | £24.33k | £9.33k | £9.65k | £2.40k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 01 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 November 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 05 November 2021 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 December 2020 | 54 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11TH APRIL 1984
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE SOCIAL AND NATURAL HISTORY, GEOLOGY AND ARCHAEOLOGY OF ENGLAND WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO AGRICULTURE AND AGRICULTURAL HISTORY IN CAMBRIDGESHIRE AND THE FENS.
Area of benefit
CAMBRIDGESHIRE AND THE FENS
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Farmland Museum & Denny Abbey
Ely Road
Waterbeach
CAMBRIDGE
CB25 9PQ
- Phone:
- 01223 860988
- Email:
- info@farmlandmuseum.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window