Financial history THE LEIGH VILLAGE HALLS

Charity number: 289588
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £26.68k £26.66k £27.51k £32.81k £30.58k
Total expenditure £15.13k £15.17k £21.04k £26.74k £27.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £200 £500
Income from government grants £11.33k £9.72k N/A N/A N/A