SENSE, THE NATIONAL DEAFBLIND AND RUBELLA ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sense exists so that no one who is deafblind or has other complex disabilities is isolated, left out, or unable to fulfil their potential. Across the country, we support children and adults to communicate and experience the world. We provide information and advice, offer a wide range of flexible services and campaign for the rights of people with complex disabilities to take part in life.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£94,976,185
Donations and legacies | £13.98m | |
Charitable activities | £64.41m | |
Other trading activities | £15.75m | |
Investments | £471.01k | |
Other | £371.98k |
Total expenditure:
£97,474,231
Raising funds | £6.40m | |
Charitable activities | £73.68m | |
Other | £17.40m |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £57,167,458 from 480 government contract(s) and £463,138 from 9 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £23.80m | |
Charitable expenditure | £73.68m |
People

2851 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
2000 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 19 |
£70k to £80k | 7 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
£90k to £100k | 3 |
£100k to £110k | 3 |
£110k to £120k | 1 |
£150k to £200k | 1 |
One or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
Governance
- 26 July 1984: Standard registration
- 25 May 2016: Funds received from 1078181 THE MONDAY CLUB FOR THE BLIND
- 08 January 2020: Funds received from 700656 COVENTRY SOCIETY FOR THE BLIND
- 11 December 2020: Funds received from 1101417 THE KERTES FOUNDATION
- 09 November 2021: Funds received from 1078359 DUNSTABLE AND DISTRICT DISABLED SPORTS
- 27 March 2024: Funds received from 294455 THE OTTERHAYES TRUST
- 26 September 2024: Funds received from 1067367 MUSIC IN MOTION
- S E N S E (Working name)
- SENSE (Working name)
- THE NATIONAL DEAFBLIND AND RUBELLA ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- THE NATIONAL DEAF-BLIND AND RUBELLA ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Care Inspectorate Wales (CIW)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Nicholas Cammies | Chair | 12 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Christian Larsson | Trustee | 12 December 2024 |
|
|||||
Alicia McDonnell | Trustee | 12 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP CHARLES ROBERTSHAW | Trustee | 12 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Francis Cooper | Trustee | 09 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Vivienne Helen Hoskins | Trustee | 09 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Westwell | Trustee | 09 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nathan Taylor | Trustee | 09 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Simon Terry Jones | Trustee | 10 December 2019 |
|
|||||
Brian Symington | Trustee | 20 March 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £69.87m | £75.23m | £82.52m | £86.53m | £94.98m | |
|
Total expenditure | £69.47m | £70.33m | £78.21m | £90.24m | £97.47m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £46.42m | £47.92m | £48.25m | £49.51m | £57.17m | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.09m | £5.36m | £976.99k | £438.63k | £463.14k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £10.16m | £13.65m | £12.95m | £12.87m | £13.98m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £11.00m | £4.48m | £12.38m | £13.71m | £15.75m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £48.51m | £51.19m | £53.89m | £59.15m | £64.41m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £45.99k | £125.40k | £28.94k | £298.87k | £471.01k | |
|
Income - Other | £160.51k | £5.78m | £3.27m | £491.01k | £371.98k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £2.73m | £4.06m | £4.00m | £3.86m | £4.21m | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £53.20m | £54.21m | £60.45m | £69.67m | £73.68m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £16.27m | £4.01m | £4.86m | £5.58m | £6.40m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £64.78k | £37.00k | £21.64k | £74.38k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £12.11m | £12.91m | £15.00m | £17.40m |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £30.84m | £30.25m | £31.44m | £33.93m | £35.84m | |
|
Long-term investments | £447 | £450 | £450 | £450 | £450 | |
|
Other assets | £22.30m | £29.17m | £28.98m | £25.79m | £22.06m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£6.61m | -£10.03m | -£869.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £14.86m | £16.84m | £14.13m | £8.96m | £9.34m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15/06/1984 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23/09/1990 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/09/1992 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/09/1993 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/07/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 11/11/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20/10/2012 as amended on 16 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
3 Objects The objects for which the Charity is established (the "Objects") are to: 3.1 primarily support and promote the interests of persons who are deafblind or have multi-sensory impairments; 3.2 and to support persons who, by virtue of having a learning disability or one or more mental or physical impairments, or sensory impairment(s), require care and/or communication support (together, the "beneficiaries").
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
SENSE
101 PENTONVILLE ROAD
LONDON
N1 9LG
- Phone:
- 0300 330 9260
- Email:
- Clare.O'Donovan@sense.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window