Financial history MACHZIKE HADATH COMMUNITY

Charity Number: 289999
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £123.59k £81.67k £204.05k £169.46k £198.24k
Total expenditure £130.69k £58.40k £130.52k £199.29k £203.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A