MACHZIKE HADATH COMMUNITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trustees oversee the administration of the Synagogue and deal with Burial Ground and communal matters
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Barnet
Governance
- 30 November 1984: Standard registration
- MACHZIKE HADATH SYNAGOGUE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GREGORY ROEDIGER | Trustee | 01 December 2020 |
|
|||||||
JOHN LESLIE WOSNER | Trustee | 01 January 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £123.59k | £81.67k | £204.05k | £169.46k | £198.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £130.69k | £58.40k | £130.52k | £199.29k | £203.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 09 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 09 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 19 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 19 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 24 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 14 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 14 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PRELIMINARY CONSTITUTION 1949
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER THE PRACTICE AND OBSERVANCE OF TRADITONAL ORTHODOX JUDAISM IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE DICTATES OF THE SHULCHAN ARUCH AND UNDER THE DIRECTION AND GUIDANCE OF A STRICTLY ORTHODOX RAV.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 HIGHFIELD ROAD
LONDON
NW11 9LU
- Phone:
- 02084559816
- Email:
- john.wosner@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window