THE DOREEN KING FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To assist present and former pupils of Pewsey Vale School with grants towards specialist clothing, books, travel, tools when entering further or higher education. Also assist school in specific projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 21 September 1984: Standard registration
- 22 May 2023: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 22 May 2023: Funds transferred to 1123126 THE COMMUNITY FOUNDATION FOR WILTSHIRE & SWINDON
No other names
- Investment
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.50k | £2.60k | £2.67k | £2.35k | £2.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.47k | £2.49k | £2.92k | £2.09k | £1.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30 AUGUST 1984 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 25 MAR 2019
Charitable objects
PROMOTING THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF PUPILS AT PEWSEY VALE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
CATCHMENT AREA OF PEWSEY VALE SCHOOL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window