THE BOURNEMOUTH LEUKAEMIA FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The role of the Bournemouth Leukaemia Fund is to support local research into the cause, diagnosis, natural history and treatment of patients with chronic lymphoproliferative disorders, especially chronic lymphocytic leukaemia. This is achieved by funding salaries, reagent costs and attendance at meetings to present research data.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Dorset
- Hampshire
Governance
- 12 October 1984: Standard registration
- BOURNEMOUTH BLOOD RESEARCH FUND (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr David Bruce | Trustee | 30 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Harding | Trustee | 03 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Renee Grainey | Trustee | 07 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rachel Hall | Trustee | 23 June 2017 |
|
|||||
Dr JOSEPH CHACKO | Trustee | 07 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr RENATA WALEWSKA | Trustee | 09 October 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66.68k | £19.14k | £18.12k | £5.08k | £50.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £123.37k | £102.63k | £22.32k | £24.26k | £20.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 April 2025 | 166 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 April 2025 | 166 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 November 2022 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 March 2022 | 128 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 January 2021 | 87 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 26 January 2021 | 87 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 7TH SEPTEMBER 1984
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE MEDICAL PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE COUNTIES OF HAMPSHIRE AND DORSET AND IN PARTICULAR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING AND THE RESEARCH AND TREATMENT OF LEUKAEMIA AND ALL ANCILLARY WORK IN CONNECTION THEREWICH AT THE ROYAL VICTORIA HOSPITAL BOSCOMBE BOURNEMOUTH IN DORSET OR ANY HOSPITAL REPLACING OR BUILT IN CONJUNTION WITH OR IN ADDITION TO THE SAME PROVIDING THAT THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH WILL BE PUBLISHED.
Area of benefit
COUNTIES OF HAMPSHIRE AND DORSET
Contact information
- Address:
-
ROYAL BOURNEMOUTH HOSPITAL
CASTLE LANE EAST
BOURNEMOUTH
BH7 7DW
- Phone:
- 0300 019 4803
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window