THE JEWISH EDUCATIONAL AND CULTURAL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 290391
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

JECF makes discretionary grants for educational and cultural purposes both to individuals and other charities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 19 March 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Israel
  • United States

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 November 1984: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
HERTZ KAHAN Trustee
THE CHEVRAS EZRAS NITZROCHIM TRUST
Received: On time
KUPAS TZEDOKO VOCHESED TRUST
Received: On time
MIFAL TEMICHA LENESIYIN TRUST
Received: On time
OTSER GEMILLUS CHASODIM
Received: On time
MOISHE ROTTENBERG Trustee
BEIS KOSOV
Received: On time

Financial history

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 19/03/2020 19/03/2021 19/03/2022 19/03/2023 19/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 19 March 2024 30 January 2025 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 19 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 19 March 2023 08 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 19 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 19 March 2022 17 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 19 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 19 March 2021 09 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 19 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 19 March 2020 09 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 19 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
40 HEATHLAND ROAD
LONDON
N16 5LZ
Phone:
02088096151
Website:

No information available