Financial history INSTITUTE OF OUR LADY OF MERCY

Charity number: 290544
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 30/06/2024
Total gross income £10.78m £8.90m £9.12m £9.59m £14.73m
Total expenditure £17.48m £15.39m £14.12m £14.93m £24.25m
Income from government contracts £858.83k £776.65k £737.56k £609.33k £982.10k
Income from government grants N/A £234.72k £162.10k £10.67k £40.40k
Income - Donations and legacies £387.43k £68.52k £61.81k £26.84k £111.15k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £7.18m £6.18m £5.81m £5.92m £9.44m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.17m £2.61m £2.79m £2.83m £4.28m
Income - Other £37.04k £37.47k £457.54k £821.76k £903.40k
Income - Legacies £286.37k £0 £0 £0 £46.80k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £16.60m £14.96m £13.74m £14.67m £23.97m
Expenditure - Raising funds £271.43k £206.48k £206.33k £262.05k £273.35k
Expenditure - Governance £483.49k £635.02k £768.86k £918.02k £3.17m
Expenditure - Grants institution £499.79k £574.53k £478.51k £440.39k £832.84k
Expenditure - Investment management £271.43k £206.48k £206.33k £262.05k £273.35k
Expenditure - Other £612.00k £227.24k £168.38k £0 £0