THE F G ROBERTS CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
No other names
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2018 | 31/01/2019 | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.00k | £62.50k | £0 | £62.50k | £43.75k | |
|
Total expenditure | £46.75k | £47.00k | £60.00k | £57.50k | £23.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 09 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED OF SETTLEMENT DATED 29TH OCTOBER 1984
Charitable objects
SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTIONS PURPOSE OR PURPOSES IN SUCH SHARES BETWEEN THEM IF MORE THAN ONE AS THE TRUSTEES WITH THE CONSENT OF THE PATRON SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT WITH POWER WITH SUCH CONSENT AS AFORESAID (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) TO APPLY THE WHOLE OR ANY PART OR PARTS OF SUCH INCOME IN OR TOWARDS THE ESTABLISHMENT OF ANY CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR ORGANISATON.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window