THE GREAT BRITAIN SASAKAWA FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Awards grants upon application to organisations throughout the UK and Japan for UK-Japan related projects in the following fields:- youth and education, science, technology & environment, medicine & health, arts and culture, sport, the humanities, the Japanese language and Japanese studies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£1,419,553
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £320.00k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £1.10m | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,512,101
Raising funds | £87.02k | |
Charitable activities | £1.43m | |
Other | £0 |
£2,945,174 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £87.02k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.43m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £87.02k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.43m | |
Retained for future use | £2.85m |
People

3 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Japan
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 09 January 1985: Standard registration
- THE GREAT BRITAIN - SASAKAWA FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THE EARL OF ST ANDREWS | Chair | 30 May 1995 |
|
|
||||
Paul Damian Madden CMG | Trustee | 25 October 2024 |
|
|||||
Jumpei Sasakawa | Trustee | 04 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Izumi Kadono | Trustee | 12 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Lloyd Scott | Trustee | 18 September 2018 |
|
|||||
PROFESSOR JANET ELIZABETH HUNTER | Trustee | 30 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Professor Yoriko Kawaguchi | Trustee | 21 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Professor Yuichi HOSOYA | Trustee | 11 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
JOANNA PITMAN | Trustee | 06 September 2011 |
|
|||||
TATSUYA TANAMI | Trustee | 01 April 2008 |
|
|
||||
PROFESSOR DAVID ROBERT COPE | Trustee | 24 May 2006 |
|
|
||||
Ambassador Hiroaki FUJII | Trustee | 17 May 2005 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £969.77k | £11.80m | £1.45m | £1.58m | £1.42m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.27m | £1.18m | £884.12k | £1.10m | £1.51m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £11.12m | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £310.00k | £370.35k | £330.00k | £320.00k | £320.00k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £11.12m | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £659.77k | £312.12k | £1.12m | £1.26m | £1.10m | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.10m | £1.02m | £790.46k | £1.02m | £1.43m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £165.13k | £158.50k | £93.66k | £73.78k | £87.02k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £107.99k | £96.70k | £83.90k | £78.23k | £106.50k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £850.61k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £165.13k | £158.50k | £93.66k | £73.78k | £87.02k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £247 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Long-term investments | £28.39m | £29.78m | £45.85m | £41.49m | £44.67m | |
|
Other assets | £1.09m | £12.16m | £1.56m | £1.67m | £1.55m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £665.24k | £797.67k | £828.36k | £822.04k | £1.03m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 06 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND NEW ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28TH NOV 1984, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON THE 16TH NOV 1994 NOW ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 21 JULY 2010 AND BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON 21 JULY 2010
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE CITIZENS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE CITIZENS OF JAPAN IN EACH OTHERSã INSTITUTIONS, PEOPLE, HISTORY, LANGUAGE, CULTURE AND SPORT, IN SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY, MEDICINE & HEALTH AND ALSO IN EACH OTHERSã INTELLECTUAL, ARTISTIC AND ECONOMIC LIFE; (B) TO PROMOTE RESEARCH IN ANY OF THE ABOVE AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lower Ground Floor
24 Bedford Row
London
WC1R 4TQ
- Phone:
- 02074369042
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window