Financial history BIRMINGHAM OPERA COMPANY

Charity number: 291130
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £627.13k £709.57k £641.65k £839.56k £870.29k
Total expenditure £332.13k £768.72k £446.85k £693.46k £1.32m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £517.42k £32.87k £518.00k £543.00k £614.06k
Income - Donations and legacies £569.34k £666.87k £577.53k £600.30k £716.77k
Income - Other trading activities £57.79k £42.71k £64.13k £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £239.26k £153.52k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £298.99k £738.81k £417.43k £653.82k £1.27m
Expenditure - Raising funds £18.72k £18.04k £18.26k £25.87k £28.77k
Expenditure - Governance £14.42k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £14.42k £11.87k £11.17k £13.77k £19.24k