TIMOTHY JEFFERSON FIELD RESEARCH FUND

Charity number: 291466
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To award and recognise acheivement in geological research.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 July 1991: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

23 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ruth Allington Chair 25 June 2021
ECTON MINE EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
Prof Jonathan Gordon Gluyas Trustee 14 June 2023
THE GEOLOGICAL SOCIETY OF LONDON
Received: On time
Dr Chiara Maria Petrone Trustee 14 June 2023
THE GEOLOGICAL SOCIETY OF LONDON
Received: On time
Elizabeth Jane Withington Trustee 14 June 2023
THE GEOLOGICAL SOCIETY OF LONDON
Received: On time
Prof Katherine Sian Davies-Vollum Trustee 14 June 2023
THE GEOLOGICAL SOCIETY OF LONDON
Received: On time
Dr David Peter Giles Trustee 14 June 2023
THE GEOLOGICAL SOCIETY OF LONDON
Received: On time
Dr Anna Frances Bird Trustee 08 June 2022
None on record
Prof Mark William Anderson Trustee 08 June 2022
THE GEOLOGICAL SOCIETY OF LONDON
Received: On time
Dr Natasha Joanne Dowey Trustee 08 June 2022
THE GEOLOGICAL SOCIETY OF LONDON
Received: On time
Hollie Elizabeth Fisher Trustee 08 June 2022
THE GEOLOGICAL SOCIETY OF LONDON
Received: On time
Prof Daniel Paul Le Heron Trustee 08 June 2022
THE GEOLOGICAL SOCIETY OF LONDON
Received: On time
Benjamin James Lepley Trustee 08 June 2022
None on record
Prof Mark Allen Trustee 25 June 2021
None on record
Dr Amanda Owen Trustee 25 June 2021
None on record
Martin Griffin Trustee 25 June 2021
THE GEOLOGICAL SOCIETY OF LONDON
Received: On time
Dr Neil Frewin Trustee 25 June 2021
THE GEOLOGICAL SOCIETY OF LONDON
Received: On time
Dr Keith Jonathan Myers Trustee 25 June 2021
THE GEOLOGICAL SOCIETY OF LONDON
Received: On time
Peter John Christopher Loader Trustee 25 June 2021
None on record
Hannah Lucy Thomas Trustee 25 June 2021
None on record
Dr Michael Olatunde Kehinde Trustee 04 June 2020
AGAPE LIFE PROJECT
Received: On time
THE GEOLOGICAL SOCIETY OF LONDON
Received: On time
Dr Jennifer Susan Gilbert Trustee 04 June 2020
THE GEOLOGICAL SOCIETY OF LONDON
Received: On time
Gemma Marie Sherwood Trustee 06 June 2019
None on record
Professor James Sydney Griffiths Trustee 06 June 2018
LEAGUE OF FRIENDS OF DERRIFORD HOSPITAL
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total expenditure £8 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 17 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 02 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 September 2022 306 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
GEOLOGICAL SOCIETY OF LONDON
BURLINGTON HOUSE
PICCADILLY
LONDON
W1J 0BG
Phone:
0207 434 9944