Trustees NORTH NORFOLK TALKING NEWSPAPER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 291509
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Christopher Wilson Chair 14 December 2022
None on record
John Martyn Harris Trustee 06 December 2023
None on record
Richard Preston Trustee 23 August 2023
AYLSHAM COMMUNITY PARTNERSHIP
Received: On time
Lorna Rayne Wilson Trustee 17 August 2022
None on record
Dr Imogen Margaret Waterson Trustee 15 September 2021
None on record
Julia Mary Bloomfield Trustee 09 July 2019
None on record
George Winston Lambert Trustee 16 April 2019
None on record
MARGARET JOYCE PHILLIPS Trustee
None on record