CHANDOS CHAMBER CHOIR

Charity number: 291540
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Amateur choir of 30-35 voices, performing three concerts a year. The choir strives to: perform to a very high standard; engage its audiences by meaningful communication of the music; provide programme notes. The choir prefers to offer employment opportunities to musicians in the earlier stages of their career, and makes regular visits outside of London, e.g. to participate in cathedral services.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £19,540
Total expenditure: £14,090

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 17 May 1985: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • HANDEL OPERA CHORUS (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ANDREW PETER WROUT Trustee 02 January 2024
None on record
Anna Parsons Trustee 02 January 2024
None on record
KAREN PARKES Trustee 02 January 2024
None on record
TIMOTHY JAMES MCCARRON Trustee 16 November 2021
None on record
MERLIN TIMOTHY BEAKE Trustee 30 October 2018
None on record
Richard Michael Osborn Trustee 13 May 2013
MOUNT VERNON POST-GRADUATE MEDICAL CENTRE
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF POTTERS BAR
Received: On time
CHARTERED INSTITUTE OF LIBRARY AND INFORMATION PROFESSIONALS BENEVOLENT FUND
Received: On time
NEW BARNET PAROCHIAL SCHOOLS TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £8.75k £9.11k £11.91k £10.61k £19.54k
Total expenditure £10.73k £3.47k £21.31k £13.87k £14.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 02 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 28 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 24 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 14 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 16 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
TRUST DEED DATED 28TH MAY 1985
Charitable objects
PROMOTING AND FURTHERING THE CHARITABLE OBJECTS OF THE HANDEL OPERA CHORUS WHICH IS FROM 1ST SEPTEMBER 1985 TO BE KNOW AS 'THE CHANDOS CHAMBER CHORUS'.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 17 May 1985 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
22 Coppice Walk
LONDON
N20 8BZ
Phone:
07803 756088