FATIMID FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Blood bank and haematogical services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Pakistan
Governance
- 04 July 1991: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Afshan Chowdhree | Trustee | 19 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMAD ILYAS AHMED CHAUDHARY | Trustee | 23 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMAD KHALEEL CHOWDHREE | Trustee | 05 June 2012 |
|
|||||
SYED MOHSIN AKHTAR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.17k | £24.28k | £37.03k | £22.54k | £27.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.04k | £18.04k | £52.04k | £0 | £52.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 08 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 29 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 29 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 23 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 22 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 21ST MAY 1985
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUAL PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED AND DISTRESS AND TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND IMPROVE THE MEDICARE AMONGST RESIDENTS IN KARACHI AND THROUGHOUT PARKISTAN AND ALSO THE SURROUNDING REGIONS SUPPORTING THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE FATIMID FOUNDATION WHICH IS PRESENTLY SITUATED AT 393 BRITLO ROAD, GARDEN EAST KARACHI, PARKISTAN.
Area of benefit
PAKISTAN
Contact information
- Address:
-
141 Ridge Lane
Watford
WD17 4SU
- Phone:
- 07984 804843
- Email:
- admin@fatimiduk.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window