THE DENT-BROCKLEHURST FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 292097
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

DBFCT trustees meet once a year to consider applications for funding from individuals and organisations primarily in Gloucestershire and the Cotswolds.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £20,305
Total expenditure: £19,667

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Animals
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Gloucestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 July 1985: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
OLIVER PARKER Chair 22 March 1994
None on record
Christopher Robert Haslam Trustee 05 September 2022
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF WINCHCOMBE WITH GRETTON, SUDELEY MANOR AND STANLEY PONTLARGE
Received: On time
HENRY CHIPPS DENT-BROCKLEHURST Trustee 19 September 2011
None on record
LEILA ROSE PRICE Trustee 30 April 1997
None on record
ELIZABETH LADY ASHCOMBE Trustee 22 March 1994
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £22.20k £16.97k £14.04k £22.94k £20.31k
Total expenditure £16.07k £18.48k £15.05k £18.05k £19.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 23 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 20 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 16 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 20 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
17 Calcot
Fossebridge
CHELTENHAM
Gloucestershire
GL54 3JZ
Phone:
07976385006
Website:

No information available