Financial history THE HEALTHCARE PLAY SPECIALIST EDUCATION TRUST

Charity Number: 292218
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £24.97k £30.93k £29.64k £30.44k £32.54k
Total expenditure £25.47k £18.96k £24.15k £36.83k £123.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A