THE OLIVER FISHER SPECIAL CARE BABY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is established to provide and maintain medical equipment, facilities and personnel required for the treatment of babies needing intensive and special care.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kent
- Medway
Governance
- 08 August 1985: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR A SOE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sarah Jane Clarke | Trustee | 18 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Olivia Grace Lawrence | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alice Elizabeth Lawrence | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Marie Pearson | Trustee | 02 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Santosh Pattnayak | Trustee | 05 November 2018 |
|
|||||
Samantha Short | Trustee | 05 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ms H Ditton | Trustee | 06 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mr D Liddiard | Trustee | 29 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
GEOFFREY LAWRENCE | Trustee | 18 October 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £145.05k | £159.42k | £235.86k | £103.40k | £172.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £53.66k | £58.27k | £54.46k | £169.10k | £108.42k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED 17/06/1983 AS AMENDED ON 09/11/1995 AS AMENDED ON 23/10/1996 AS AMENDED ON 18/09/2012 as amended on 02 Nov 2021
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE MEDICAL EQUIPMENT, AS SUPPLEMENT TO THE SERVICE OF THE MEDWAY NHS TRUST, FOR THE TREATMENT OF BABIES NEEDING INTENSIVE AND SPECIAL CARE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR BABIES IN THE CARE OF THE OLIVER FISHER NEONATAL UNIT.
Area of benefit
CHATHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
44 Doubleday Drive
Bapchild
Sittingbourne
ME9 9PJ
- Phone:
- 07766923716
- Email:
- Geoffrey.Lawrence@nhs.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window