Accounts and annual returns THE LITTLE OWL PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 292726
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 22 February 2024 22 days late
Annual return 31 March 2022 08 April 2023 67 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 08 April 2023 67 days late
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 10 December 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 April 2021 71 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 13 June 2021 133 days late