Financial history THE LITTLE OWL PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 292726
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £49.36k £70.04k £65.58k £68.07k £66.15k
Total expenditure £55.14k £72.10k £65.88k £68.25k £76.37k
Income from government contracts £36.66k N/A N/A £51.78k N/A
Income from government grants N/A £63.18k N/A N/A N/A