DEVON COUNTY AGRICULTURAL ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 292897
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The objects of the Association are the advancement of agriculture in the County of Devon and the encouragement of education and knowledge of agriculture and country pursuits. These objects are particularly fostered by the promotion of the annual Devon County Show.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Animals
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 October 1985: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • DEVON COUNTY SHOW (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Claire Louise Heaven-Roberts Trustee 19 January 2018
MID DEVON TOWN AND COUNTRY SHOW SOCIETY LIMITED
Received: On time
Sir Henry Studholme BT DL Trustee 19 January 2018
None on record
ANDREW GRAY Trustee 22 July 2011
None on record
MARK JOSEPH WEEKES Trustee 22 July 2011
THE DEVON FARMERS' BENEVOLENT FUND
Received: On time
JOHN ALBERT THOMAS LEE OBE DL Trustee
JOHN LEE CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Recently registered
DEVON RURAL HUB
Recently registered
PHILLPOTTS AND BOYD EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
DEAN BOYD'S CHARITY FOR APPRENTICING
Received: On time
REYNOLDS WHALE TRUST FOR ORDINANDS
Received: On time
THE MARY MARRIOTT TRUST
Received: On time
BISHOP PHILPOTTS' AND DEAN BOYD'S CHURCH ENDOWMENT FUNDS
Received: On time
BOYD FOR EXHIBITIONS
Received: On time
THE CARYLL WENBORN TRUST FUND
Received: On time
DEAN AND CHAPTER OF EXETER CATHEDRAL SCHOOL PRIZE FUND
Received: On time
REVEREND CHANCELLOR HARINGTON FOR CHORISTERS OF EXETER CATHEDRAL
Received: On time
EXETER CATHEDRAL
Recently registered
Friends of Shobrooke Church
Received: On time
THE RURAL YOUTH TRUST
Received: On time
SOUTH WEST LAKES TRUST
Received: On time
DEBORAH CUSTANCE-BAKER Trustee
None on record
M H RETALLICK Trustee
None on record
STR STEVENS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £2.56m £1.05m £2.05m £2.28m £2.82m
Total expenditure £2.32m £1.23m £1.76m £2.01m £2.59m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £91.59k £106.51k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £10.38k £2.37k £3.70k £17.88k
Income - Other trading activities £1.08m £780.97k £709.23k £886.43k £1.27m
Income - Charitable activities £1.39m £72.80k £1.14m £1.27m £1.37m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £86.22k £82.09k £91.01k £116.01k £162.52k
Income - Other £0 £108.43k £106.50k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.87m £822.02k £1.48m £1.70m £2.13m
Expenditure - Raising funds £450.92k £0 £0 £0 £453.80k
Expenditure - Governance £11.13k £15.46k £7.11k £6.67k £13.43k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £405.32k £280.98k £316.62k £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Own use assets £3.11m £3.40m £3.25m £3.14m £3.02m
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £388.19k £378.67k £1.06m £1.24m £1.38m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £564.00k £1.01m £1.25m £1.07m £840.31k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 24 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 24 June 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 13 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 13 February 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 26 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 26 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 29 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 29 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 28 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 28 July 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
WESTPOINT
CLYST ST MARY
EXETER
DEVON
EX5 1DJ
Phone:
01392446000