INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR UTILITARIAN STUDIES

Charity number: 292931
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Organizes academic conferences relating to utilitarianism, and supports the work of the Bentham Project, UCL.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £24,147
Total expenditure: £3,428

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Canada
  • China
  • France
  • Germany
  • Italy
  • Japan
  • Macau
  • Scotland
  • Spain
  • United States

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 November 1985: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • INTERNATIONAL BENTHAM SOCIETY (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Peter Lythe Trustee 06 July 2023
None on record
Professor Malik Bozzo-Rey Trustee 06 July 2023
None on record
PROFESSOR PHILIP SCHOFIELD Trustee
None on record
PROFESSOR PAUL JOSEPH KELLY Trustee
None on record
Professor ROGER CRISP Trustee
ST ANNE'S COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £1.25k £57 £4.05k £1.20k £24.15k
Total expenditure £8.00k £0 £0 £0 £3.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 08 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 01 August 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 23 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
UNIVERSITY COLLEGE LONDON
GOWER STREET
LONDON
WC1E 6BT
Phone:
02031088480
Email:
No information available