THE BRITISH ORIGAMI SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aims of the BOS are: to promote and increase public knowledge and awareness of origami, to encourage the practice of origami in education and as therapy for the mentally and physically disabled and to create, maintain and preserve an origami archive. We enable designers of origami to reach a wider audience though our publications and exhibitions, and encourage our members to teach origami.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

18 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 03 December 1985: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Claire Joanne Faulkes | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Robert O'Hare | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Joseph William Frank Munro | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Martin John Quinn | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Philip Edwin Swinbank | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Hugh McElveen | Trustee | 14 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
JAMES HOWARD SIMON | Trustee | 14 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Brendan Plumb | Trustee | 14 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Zulay Beatriz Sayalero Dorante | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bridie Begbie | Trustee | 17 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL PAUL GUY | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Jane Moore | Trustee | 07 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Robert Hill | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Russell Wood | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Mr Nick Griffiths | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Adam Robert Woodhouse | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ANTHONY RAYNOR | Trustee | 25 May 2012 |
|
|||||
PAUL DEREK HANSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.30k | £37.14k | £20.55k | £24.05k | £51.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £56.81k | £40.01k | £31.02k | £40.42k | £53.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28TH OCTOBER 1967 AMENDED 12TH OCTOBER 1985, 12 APRIL 1987, 15 APRIL 1989 AND 5 OCTOBER 1991. FURTHER AMENDED 12 SEPTEMBER 1992 AND 3 APRIL 1993. AS AMENDED ON 12 SEP 2020 as amended on 11 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTIVES OF THE SOCIETY ARE: TO PROMOTE AND INCREASE PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND AWARENESS OF ORIGAMI, TO ENCOURAGE THE PRACTICE OF ORIGAMI IN EDUCATION AND AS THERAPY FOR THE MENTALLY AND PHYSICALLY DISABLED AND TO CREATE, MAINTAIN AND PRESERVE AN ORIGAMI ARCHIVE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 LYNWOOD AVENUE
SLOUGH
SL3 7BJ
- Phone:
- 01753676011
- Email:
- treasurer@britishorigami.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window