THE BOURNE SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Local History
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

14 Trustee(s)
78 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Croydon
- Surrey
Governance
- 11 December 1985: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Philip John Swallow | Trustee | 12 May 2025 |
|
|||||
Lizzie Mould | Trustee | 11 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Anthony Redington | Trustee | 25 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Barry Stanton | Trustee | 25 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Elizabeth Ward | Trustee | 25 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Irene Mary Keefe | Trustee | 25 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
GWYNETH MARGARET FOOKES | Trustee | 25 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Raymond Howgego | Trustee | 25 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joyce Pamela Hoad | Trustee | 25 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY PAUL VAVASOUR SANDFORD | Trustee | 25 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Jean Bonsall | Trustee | 25 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Linda Anne Mutler | Trustee | 09 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
HAZEL YVONNE MARSDEN | Trustee | 06 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
ROGER CHARLES PACKHAM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.38k | £13.49k | £13.70k | £12.53k | £14.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.99k | £16.39k | £14.87k | £14.96k | £14.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 16 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 05 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19/11/1985. AS AMENDED 9TH SEPTEMBER 1993 AS AMENDED ON 19 MAR 2016 as amended on 25 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
TO EXTEND THE KNOWLEDGE OF LOCAL HISTORY BY THE INVESTIGATION AND RECORDING OF THE HISTORY OF CATERHAM, CHALDON, CHELSHAM, CHIPSTEAD, COULSDON, FARLEIGH, GODSTONE, KENLEY, PURLEY, SANDERSTEAD, WHYTELEAFE, WARLINGHAM, WOLDINGHAM AND ASSOCIATED DISTRICTS; TO FOSTER AN INTEREST IN LOCAL HISTORY AND TO ENCOURAGE MEMBERS AND THE PUBLIC TO LEARN MORE OF THEIR DISTRICT'S HISTORY, TO ENSURE THE PRESERVATION OF RECORDS AND OBJECTS OF HISTORICAL INTEREST AND TO PROMOTE AN AWARENESS OF THE NEED FOR CONSERVATION IN THE SOCIETY'S AREA.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Drake Avenue
CATERHAM
Surrey
CR3 5BS
- Phone:
- 01883341759
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window