THE CATHOLIC FAMILY HISTORY SOCIETY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Catholic Family History Society exists to encourage Catholics and those who have Catholic ancestry (however distant) to research their family histories; it also encourages members to transcribe church registers where available and, with copyright permission, these are published and brought into the public domain. CDs and printed publications are available worldwide via Genfair.co.uk.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Scotland
Governance
- 26 November 1985: Standard registration
- 29 August 2024: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 29 August 2024: Funds transferred to 515599 THE MANCHESTER AND LANCASHIRE FAMILY HISTORY SOCIE...
- 29 August 2024: Funds transferred to 527408 ST CUTHBERT'S COLLEGE USHAW
- 29 August 2024: Funds transferred to 233701 SOCIETY OF GENEALOGISTS
- THE ENGLISH CATHOLIC ANCESTOR SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.25k | £3.62k | £3.30k | £1.93k | £955 | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.47k | £3.91k | £2.73k | £1.77k | £2.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 19 August 2024 | 80 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 15 August 2023 | 76 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 05 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 18 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 5TH OCTOBER 1985; AND AS AMENDED BY SCHEME SEALED 3RD OCTOBER 1995. as amended on 14 Sep 2021
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE STUDY OF THE FAMILY HISTORY AND GENEALOGY OF ENGLISH CATHOLICS. (B) TO PROVIDE EDUCATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE STUDY OF FAMILY HISTORY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window