Accounts and annual returns BRITISH SOCIETY OF PHYSICAL AND REHABILITATION MEDICINE

Charity number: 293196
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 11 December 2024 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 11 December 2024 41 days late
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 September 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 30 September 2023 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 January 2023 92 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 31 January 2023 92 days late
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 31 October 2021 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On Time