STROUD SYMPHONY ORCHESTRA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
An amateur symphony orchestra providing a cultural experience both to its members in rehearsals and to the audience at the public concerts which we perform, in Stroud, Gloucestershire and local area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 21 January 1986: Standard registration
- NEW STROUD ORCHESTRA (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Pemberton | Trustee | 08 July 2022 |
|
|||||||||||
James William Angus Hutton | Trustee | 08 July 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
JOHN WOODWARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
JONATHAN MICHAEL THOMAS TRIM | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
ALISON MARY WOOD | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.45k | £1.80k | £8.58k | £12.12k | £13.82k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.89k | £3.26k | £9.06k | £11.71k | £10.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 12 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 14TH NOVEMBER 1983
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION IN AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF MUSIC BY THE PRESENTATION OF PUBLIC CONCERTS OF ORCHESTRAL AND CHORAL WORKS AND CHAMBER MUSIC, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE STROUD AREA.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE GRANGE
SELSLEY ROAD
NORTH WOODCHESTER
STROUD
GL5 5PJ
- Phone:
- 07973187923
- Email:
- stroudso@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window