ST LUKE'S OXFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Long term nursing care, palliative care, respite care and post-operative rehabilitation for sick, disabled and older persons regardless of their means.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£4,913,424
Donations and legacies | £155.02k | |
Charitable activities | £4.72m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £23.99k | |
Other | £12.60k |
Total expenditure:
£4,580,436
Raising funds | £9.45k | |
Charitable activities | £4.57m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £9.45k | |
Charitable expenditure | £4.57m | |
Retained for future use | £332.99k |
People

95 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 26 February 1986: Standard registration
- ST LUKE'S HOSPITAL (Working name)
- ST LUKES HOSPITAL-OXFORD (Working name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LUKE PONSONBY | Chair | 25 June 2014 |
|
|||||||
Tessa Louise McGrigor | Trustee | 02 October 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Simon Polito | Trustee | 27 March 2024 |
|
|||||||
Nicholas Ritchie | Trustee | 27 March 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Tina Welford | Trustee | 16 December 2020 |
|
|||||||
Peter Burge | Trustee | 24 March 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Lady Juliet NORMAN | Trustee | 24 June 2015 |
|
|
||||||
Graham Candy | Trustee | 10 December 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.25m | £3.49m | £3.91m | £4.62m | £4.91m | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.32m | £3.74m | £3.73m | £4.28m | £4.58m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £239.76k | £85.94k | £95.98k | £60.30k | £155.02k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £162.46k | £0 | £3.71m | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £2.84m | £3.17m | £0 | £4.55m | £4.72m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £13.18k | £4.35k | £0 | £593 | £23.99k | |
|
Income - Other | £2.18k | £221.22k | £100.84k | £13.57k | £12.60k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £3.29m | £3.74m | £3.72m | £4.27m | £4.57m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £33.76k | £0 | £9.64k | £12.58k | £9.45k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £8.60k | £256.03k | £475.44k | £673.29k | £682.95k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £10.60m | £10.40m | £10.21m | £7.32m | £7.39m | |
|
Long-term investments | £347.31k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £513.83k | £729.60k | £994.46k | £1.28m | £1.28m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £3.65m | £3.55m | £3.44m | £3.28m | £3.01m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 15 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14TH FEBRUARY 1986 AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION OF 29 SEPTEMBER 2003, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 24 SEPTEMBER 2007. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 28 SEPTEMBER 2009. AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21 MAR 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE ASSOCIATION IS ESTABLISHED ARE THE RELIEF AND CARE OF THE ELDERLY, SICK, DISABLED AND POOR FROM ALL FAITHS AND THOSE OF NONE, INCLUDING, TO THE EXTENT THAT IT IS RELEVANT AND PRACTICAL TO DO SO, IN A MANNER AND ATMOSPHERE APPROPRIATE TO SUCH FAITH. IN PURSUIT OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS, THE ASSOCIATION SHALL: 1. ASSIST IN THE TREATMENT AND CARE OF PERSONS SUFFERING FROM PHYSICAL ILLNESS OF ANY DESCRIPTION OR IN NEED OF REHABILITATION AS A RESULT OF SUCH ILLNESS, BY THE PROVISION OF LONG-TERM NURSING CARE, PALLIATIVE CARE, RESPITE CARE AND POST-OPERATIVE REHABILITATION FOR SICK, DISABLED AND ELDERLY PERSONS; 2. ENDEAVOUR TO PROMOTE THE DIGNITY AND QUALITY OF LIFE DUE TO EVERY INDIVIDUAL, SEEING EACH AS A WHOLE PERSON, AND AIMING TO GIVE ALL THOSE SUFFERING FROM PAIN AND DISABILITY THE OPPORTUNITY FOR GROWTH IN HAPPINESS AND SPIRITUAL DEVELOPMENT; AND 3. OFFER SPIRITUAL SUPPORT FOR PATIENTS TO THE EXTENT THAT PATIENTS WISH TO SEEK SUCH CONSULTATION, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF VISITS FROM SUCH PEOPLE OF FAITH AS ARE APPROPRIATE, WHICH MAY INCLUDE SERVICES IN THE HOSPITAL CHAPEL.
Area of benefit
OXFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
LATIMER ROAD
OXFORD
OX3 7PF
- Phone:
- 01865228800
- Email:
- admin@stlukeshosp.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window