THE IDA CARROLL DOUBLE BASS AWARD TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE STUDY PRACTICE AND APPRECIATION OF MUSIC (AND MORE PARTICULARLY THE DOUBLE BASS) WHO ARE AT THE TIME OF AWARD UNDER THE AGE OF 19 YEARS
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 February 1986: Standard registration
- 09 January 2015: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 09 January 2015: Funds transferred to 1059193 THE IDA CARROLL TRUST
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47 | £649 | £68 | £12 | £32 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £500 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 14 February 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 01 November 2012 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 27TH OF SEPTEMBER 1985
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE STUDY PRACTICE AND APPRECIATION OF MUSIC (AND MORE PARTICULARLY THE DOUBLE BASS) IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) BY THE GRANT OF AN ANNUAL AWARDS (TO BE KNOWN AS IDA CARROLL DOUBLE BASS AWARDS) FOR STUDENTS OF THE DOUBLE BASS WHO ARE AT THE TIME OF AWARD UNDER THE AGE OF 19 YEARS AND RESIDENT OR STUDYING IN THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window