ASSOCIATION FOR SUFFOLK MUSEUMS

Charity number: 293950
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Association supports the development and standards of Suffolk museums and acts as their representative to other bodies. It works to serve the people of Suffolk and its visitors through joint museum projects, professional training of museums' staff and volunteers,along with helping the ambition and achievements of the county's museums through providing professional information and advice.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £68,419
Total expenditure: £66,651

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Suffolk

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 April 1986: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Social media policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Patricia Hardy Trustee 27 February 2024
None on record
Cllr Philip Faircloth-Mutton Trustee 27 February 2024
None on record
Cllr Julia Ewart Trustee 17 October 2023
None on record
Cllr Ollie Walters Trustee 17 October 2023
None on record
Marilyn Sayer Trustee 17 October 2023
WEST STOW SAXON VILLAGE TRUST
Received: On time
Carole Stephanie Palmer Trustee 17 October 2023
THE MILDENHALL AND DISTRICT MUSEUM
Received: On time
Mark Smith Trustee 06 June 2023
None on record
Fraser Hale Trustee 29 September 2022
None on record
Joe Carr Trustee 20 October 2020
None on record
KEVIN JOHN SULLIVAN Trustee 20 October 2020
LANDGUARD AND FELIXSTOWE CONSERVATION TRUST
Received: 68 days late
LANDGUARD FORT TRUST
Received: On time
THE FELIXSTOWE HISTORY AND MUSEUM SOCIETY
Charity reporting is overdue by 97 days
Jayne Emma Austin Trustee 16 November 2016
None on record
Cllr JOHN MICHAEL NUNN Trustee 18 June 2015
LONG MELFORD VILLAGE MEMORIAL HALL
Received: On time
THE HAMILTON CHARITY
Received: On time
LONG MELFORD HERITAGE TRUST
Received: On time
Cllr CAROLE JONES Trustee 18 June 2015
IPSWICH BUILDING PRESERVATION TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
Lisa Harris Trustee 24 June 2014
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £24.08k £86.47k £111.74k £45.33k £68.42k
Total expenditure £18.91k £64.30k £98.90k £100.43k £66.65k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £12.50k £80.80k £105.74k £39.12k £58.33k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 29 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 29 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 14 September 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2024 365 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 31 January 2024 365 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 March 2022 38 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 22 March 2022 50 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 17 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
c/o SUFFOLK COUNTY COUNCIL
ENDEAVOUR HOUSE
RUSSELL ROAD
IPSWICH
IP1 2BX
Phone:
07720213193