HAMPTON POOL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVISION OF A PUBLIC SWIMMING POOL AND VARIOUS ALLIED ACTIVITIES
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
85 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Richmond Upon Thames
- Surrey
Governance
- 07 April 1986: Standard registration
- HAMPTON POOL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gillian Radcliffe | Trustee | 23 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Roger Stewart Gray | Trustee | 09 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Peter Gill | Trustee | 04 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Roxanne Glaud | Trustee | 28 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Alexander Kirkwood Brown | Trustee | 12 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jill Alice Livesey | Trustee | 18 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Grahame Alexander Christopher HADDEN | Trustee | 04 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAPHNE MARGARET WHARTON | Trustee | 04 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jane Savidge | Trustee | 04 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
MIKE WHITE | Trustee | 06 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
STUART NIGEL LEAMY | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £398.95k | £44.87k | £210.96k | £475.64k | £434.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £312.85k | £36.13k | £25.87k | £316.05k | £310.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £19.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 February 2024 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 02 February 2024 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05/01/1986 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24/06/2009 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 28/01/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 21/01/2016 as amended on 13 Dec 2021 as amended on 04 Dec 2023
Charitable objects
3. THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE TRUST IS ESTABLISHED ARE: 3.1. TO PROVIDE SWIMMING AND ASSOCIATED FACILITIES AT HAMPTON SWIMMING POOL SITUATE AT HIGH STREET, HAMPTON, MIDDLESEX, FOR THE BENEFIT OF ALL INHABITANTS OF HAMPTON, HAMPTON HILL AND LOCAL AREA AFORESAID WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR POLITICAL OR OTHER OPINIONS; 3.2 TO ASSOCIATE WITH LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND THE SAID INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO PROVIDE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE SUCH SWIMMING AND ASSOCIATED FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
HAMPTON AND HAMPTON HILL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hampton Swimming Baths
High Street
Hampton
TW12 2ST
- Phone:
- 02082551116
- Email:
- info@hamptonpooltrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window