THE JOHN SIMONDS TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education in the countryside.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
Total income includes £54,218 from 13 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bracknell Forest
- Hampshire
- Reading
- Slough
- West Berkshire
- Windsor And Maidenhead
- Wokingham
Governance
- 17 July 1986: Standard registration
- 03 March 2023: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 03 March 2023: Funds transferred to 1197339 THE JOHN SIMONDS TRUST
- JOHN SIMONDS TRUST EDUCATION IN THE COUNTRYSIDE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £156.23k | £172.86k | £229.94k | £147.83k | £206.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £149.13k | £263.53k | £271.36k | £158.47k | £186.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | £43.90k | £54.22k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 10 June 2020 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 29TH APRIL 1986 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF JAN 2007
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECTS IN PARTICULAR OF (1) ENCOURAGING THE QUALITIES OF LEADERSHIP, SELF-CONFIDENCE AND MUTUAL RESPECT IN YOUNG PEOPLE; (2) PROMOTING A LOVE AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE COUNTRYSIDE; (3) ENABLING PEOPLE TO LEARN ABOUT THE COUNTRYSIDE AND AGRICULTURE ; (4) DEVELOPING CO-OPERATION BETWEEN THE AGRICULTURAL COMMUNITY AND THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window