THE BROOKING ARCHITECTURAL MUSEUM TRUST

Charity Number: 294368
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The principal activity of the Trust is to advance the education of the public in the architecture of the United Kingdom and including specifically the preservation and maintenance of the Brooking Collection. The activities of the charity are governed by a deed of trust dated 11 April 1986.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 28 February 2013

Total income: £4,934
Total expenditure: £18,537

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 May 1986: Standard registration
  • 24 February 2015: Removed (Transfer of funds)
  • 24 February 2015: Funds transferred to 1155363 The Brooking
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • THE BROOKING COLLECTION (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2009 28/02/2010 28/02/2011 28/02/2012 28/02/2013
Total gross income £5.05k £5.18k £20.40k £28.50k £4.93k
Total expenditure £5.00k £5.43k £20.06k £14.52k £18.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2014 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2014 Not submitted
Annual return 28 February 2013 30 August 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2013 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2012 19 December 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2012 19 December 2012 On Time
Annual return 28 February 2011 12 April 2012 106 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2011 Not Required