Financial history ASHA PROJECTS

Charity number: 294516
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £385.11k £468.60k £469.86k £646.32k £769.15k
Total expenditure £365.16k £427.42k £414.81k £509.45k £552.80k
Income from government contracts £82.31k £84.92k £91.32k £301.48k £350.02k
Income from government grants N/A £71.50k £42.83k £45.07k £45.07k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £1.60k £977
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £644.57k £766.91k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £142 £1.26k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £509.45k £552.80k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £9.46k £11.77k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0